Financial history THE BLACKTOFT, FAXFLEET AND YOKEFLEET POOR'S LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 226882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £1.10k £1.08k £1.24k £1.13k £1.31k
Total expenditure £0 £1.52k £320 £55 £55
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A