Linked charities THE LANCASTER PRISON CHARITIES
Charity number: 226897
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 21 MARCH 1890, 16 SEPTEMBER 1949 AND 18 MARCH 1952
Charitable objects
ASSISTANCE OF DISCHARGED PRISONERS PRIMARILY WHO HAVE BEEN IMPRISONED IN PRESTON PRISON; OR WHO HAD BEEN COMMITTED FROM MAGISTRATES COURTS PREFERABLY WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF PRESTON OR THE COUNTY OF LANCASTER
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF PRESTON OR THE COUNTY OF LANCASTER
Registration history
- 19 March 1964 : Standard registration
- 23 February 2001 : Removed
- 23 February 2001 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.