TROUTBECK INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 226929
Charity reporting is up to date (165 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing amenities for village activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £13,346
Total expenditure: £21,409

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 August 1963: Standard registration
  • 01 June 2022: Funds received from 222720 BORWICKE'S AND JACKSON'S (TROUTBECK) CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Monica Liddell Trustee 15 November 2024
None on record
Gillian Eshelby Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Maureen Anne Jackson Trustee 16 March 2015
None on record
SUSAN BLACK Trustee 13 September 2013
None on record
MR ALAN MITCHINSON Trustee
None on record
JUDITH MARGARET COCHRANE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £13.58k £18.04k £25.01k £10.48k £13.35k
Total expenditure £11.88k £12.22k £9.84k £59.06k £21.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £17.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 12 February 2025 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 12 February 2025 531 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 12 February 2025 896 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 24 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 22 September 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TROUTBECK INSTITUTE
ROBIN LANE
TROUTBECK
WINDERMERE
LA23 1PF
Phone:
01539433642
Website:

No information available