WALWORTH RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is to provide financial assisstance to children in need in the London Borough of Southwark
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Southwark
Governance
- 07 January 1977: Standard registration
- 02 December 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 02 December 2010: Funds transferred to 312317 ST MARY NEWINGTON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
- WALWORTH UNITED CHARITIES (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.35k | £2.21k | £3.15k | £2.49k | £2.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £1.77k | £2.08k | £3.32k | £1.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 04 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 11 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 26 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 18 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 14 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7 JAN 1977, AS AMENDED 12 FEB 2004 AND 11 NOV 2010 BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF S.74 CHARITIES ACT 1993 (AS AMENDED 2006).
Charitable objects
RELIEF IN NEED OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK.
Area of benefit
FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window