HARTHILL TEA DAY SOCIAL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING A CATERED TEA AND SOCIAL EVENT EVERY TWO WEEKS AND ADDED ACTIVITIES THROUGHOUT THE YEAR
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Rotherham
Governance
- 11 November 1963: Standard registration
- HARTHILL OVER 60'S CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marlene Lockwood | Chair | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bateman | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Klinker | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Watson | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pat Downs | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Panter | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Murray | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Marlene Popple | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mason | Trustee | 01 April 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.62k | £3.56k | £3.39k | £14.23k | £6.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.68k | £2.56k | £6.12k | £12.10k | £9.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND MEMORANDUM DATED DECEMBER 1949.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF ALL OLD PEOPLE IN HARTHILL AND WOODALL BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF HARTHILL WITH WOODALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 The Brambles
7 Walseker Lane
Woodall, Harthill
Sheffield
South Yorkshire
s26 7YJ
- Phone:
- 07793 863547
- Email:
- amurrayatholl@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window