Accounts and annual returns LOCKER FAMILY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 227004
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required