Financial history THE NUFFIELD RESEARCH FELLOWSHIP (OF THE CANCER RESEARCH CAMPAIGN)

Charity number: 227018
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £98.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A