Trustees THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
Charity Number: 227033

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Smith | Chair | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Justin David Ellis | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kaye Lorna Masefield Baker | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gary Michael Lee | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julia Bridges | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Julian Massow | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Joseph Allen | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer McElhinney | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL RICHARD MARTIN | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MANDY MAY THOMAS-ATKIN | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Henry Gribble | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.