CHARITY OF FLORENCE R L BLAGG FOR THE PRESTON BRANCH OF THE SOLDIERS' SAILORS' AND AIRMEN'S FAMILIES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assists disabled Soldiers, Sailors and Airmen in the Preston, Lancashire Postcode area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 May 1963: Standard registration
- BLAGG FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Col Johnny Lighten | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MITCHELL | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carole Morley | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213 | £246 | £259 | £259 | £259 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £439 | £326 | £100 | £398 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF FLORENCE R. L. BLAGG
Charitable objects
ASSISTING DISABLED SOLDIERS, SAILORS AND AIRMEN IN PRESTON.
Area of benefit
PRESTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
RHQ DUKE OF LANCASTER'S REGIMEN
FULWOOD BARRACKS
WATLING STREET ROAD
FULWOOD
PRESTON
PR2 8AA
- Phone:
- 01772260462
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window