THE ELIZABETH CASSON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The furtherance of the profession of Occupational Therapy through education, training and research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Elizabeth Roberts | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Phillip Jasper James Lennon | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Song Yau Chung | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adetokunbo Odutayo | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Louise Tuppeny | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Emily Khanna | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Caroline Lane | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Olaniyi Vera-Cruz | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jane Melton | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Avril Elizabeth Roberta Drummond | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bennett | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Denise Joan Christie | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Eve Fletcher-Hankinson | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.65k | £213.85k | £260.33k | £266.97k | £277.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.85k | £440.73k | £303.27k | £362.79k | £475.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DECLARATION DATED 04 NOVEMBER 1949 AMD MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASS. OF 30 JUNE 1948 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 20 AUGUST 1992 AND 04 NOVEMBER 1993 as amended on 21 Oct 2020 as amended on 14 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Trust is established intend to further the profession of occupational therapy through education and scholarship activity, and to develop the provision of occupational therapy services through evidence informed practice, but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing: a) To support the participation of registered occupational therapists, both in the United Kingdom and internationally, in higher education and professional development activities through the provision of funding awards. b) To provide support in the provision of occupational therapy services, wheresoever the service is being delivered, to improve the health and wellbeing of individuals, groups and communities experiencing occupational disruption, with a view to the dissemination of knowledge, both within and beyond the profession, to further the profession of occupational therapy. c) To establish sustainable centres for the study and research into occupational therapy and occupation focussed interventions with a view to improving all aspects of the occupational therapy process through the implementation and adoption of new evidence and knowledge. d) To generally raise the profile of and promote the profession of occupational therapy and its benefits to the health and wellbeing of individuals, groups and communities through the activities of the Trust and Trustees. e) To offer scholarships, grants and awards to registered occupational therapists on such terms and conditions and in such amounts as the Trustees agree at their absolute discretion.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bronsens Accountants Ltd
Eden House
Two Rivers Ind Est
Station Lane
WITNEY
Oxfordsh
- Phone:
- +441993 776593
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window