E K AND D WRIGHT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to Rigistered Charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Christopher Woodward | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS D ELDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA JUDITH AITKEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH MARGARET AITKEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORDON HUNTER AITKEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR ALEX E ELDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53k | £2.65k | £2.66k | £2.86k | £2.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.52k | £3.16k | £2.81k | £3.01k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 14TH FEBRUARY 1963 as amended on 21 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARTS
NETHER COMPTON
SHERBORNE
DT9 4PZ
- Phone:
- 01935817059
- Email:
- liz@lizandgordon.info
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window