EAST SUSSEX DISTRICT NURSES BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 January 1964: Standard registration
- 29 August 2013: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105 | £129 | £108 | £8 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £253 | £480 | £738 | £363 | £656 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 12 April 2013 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 19 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 03 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 09 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 12 May 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 30TH JUNE 1987 AS AMENDED ON 5 JANUARY 2004 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 (2) (D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO WORKED AS DISTRICT NURSES IN THE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX AND WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
EAST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window