Linked charities CHARITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE FORMER 1ST BN AND FORMER 2ND BN THE DURHAM LIGHT INFANTRY
Charity number: 227317
Removed charity
Linked charities
- CENTRAL BAND FUND
- CENTRAL BAND INSTRUMENTS AND EQUIPMENT
- CENTRAL BUGLES
- CENTRAL POLO FUND
- COMMANDING OFFICERS CENTRAL FUND
- OFFICERS' CENTRAL MESS CHATTELS
- OFFICERS' CENTRAL MESS FUND
- PRESIDENT OF THE REGEMENTAL INSTITUTES CENTRAL CHATTELS
- PRESIDENT OF THE REGIMENTAL INSTITUTE'S CENTRAL FUND
- SERGEANTS' CENTRAL MESS CHATTELS
- SERGEANTS' CENTRAL MESS FUND
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 26 AUGUST 1952, 19 SEPTEMBER 1961, 5 JULY 1962
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OR EQUIVALENT PURPOSES OF ANY OF THE REGULAR UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT AND IF NOT REQUIRED BY THE REGULAR UNITS MAY BE APPLIED FOR EQUIVALENT PURPOSES IN RESPECT OF ANY OTHER UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 24 February 1964 : Standard registration
- 17 January 1992 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.