THE CAMBER MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run the village hall for villagers use and the up keep of the building
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,552 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Bristow | Chair | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Oirshot | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Parsons | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA BIRKS | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.09k | £30.65k | £14.65k | £13.83k | £10.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.21k | £32.55k | £6.91k | £9.92k | £14.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £4.03k | £3.72k | £4.61k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.50k | £8.00k | £500 | £4.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 07/03/1958 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC OR VILLAGE HALL FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CAMBER AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Area of benefit
CAMBER
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Lydd Road
Camber
RYE
TN31 7RJ
- Phone:
- 01797458198
- Email:
- camberhall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
camberhall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window