THE CONGREGATION OF THE HOLY SPIRIT AND THE IMMACULATE HEART OF MARY (BRITISH PROVINCE)

Charity number: 227350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the Charity/Province is to advance the religious, missionary or other charitable work of the Roman Catholic faith.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Belgium
  • Brazil
  • Ghana
  • Italy
  • Kenya
  • Nigeria
  • Philippines
  • Scotland
  • South Africa
  • Tanzania
  • United States
  • Vietnam

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • SPIRITANS (Working name)
  • THE CONGREGATION OF THE HOLY GHOST (Working name)
  • THE HOLY GHOST FATHERS (Working name)
  • ENGLISH PROVINCE OF THE CONGREGATION OF THE HOLY GHOST AND THE IMMACULATE HEART OF MARY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Ugochukwu Ikwuka CSSp Chair 01 September 2024
None on record
Rev Solomon Shamee CSSp Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rev Patrick Adusei-Poku CSSp Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rev Georges Matip Arthur Marie CSSp Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rev Ricklan Stephen Mallya CSSp Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.11m £1.58m £2.02m £2.04m £2.13m
Total expenditure £1.84m £1.63m £1.87m £1.90m £2.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.38m £1.14m £1.42m £1.24m £1.49m
Income - Other trading activities £234.61k £54.46k £45.96k £159.07k £159.65k
Income - Charitable activities £202.95k £60.00k £206.08k £271.91k £160.90k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £295.57k £302.91k £320.76k £318.65k £319.96k
Income - Other £384 £22.29k £24.22k £57.87k £0
Income - Legacies £288.50k £225.02k £204.27k £29.33k £66.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £281.37k £1.58m £1.82m £1.86m £2.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £48.71k £40.64k £43.32k £38.51k £62.45k
Expenditure - Governance £118.40k £0 £210.45k £179.32k £221.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £19.74k £17.44k £19.92k £15.02k £19.50k
Expenditure - Other £1.51m £7.25k £0 £0 £760

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £2.44m £2.45m £2.47m £2.49m £2.52m
Long-term investments £8.16m £9.75m £10.03m £9.87m £10.02m
Other assets £1.32m £1.01m £1.27m £1.26m £1.26m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £252.38k £227.67k £143.68k £78.79k £125.66k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
60 Hoole Road
Chester
CH2 3NL
Phone:
01244344048