Trustees ROBERT HIBBERT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 227358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD DOGGRELL Trustee 25 February 2025
None on record
LOUISE BARTH Trustee 15 February 2025
None on record
HELEN THOMPSON Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Jean Hoar Trustee 31 October 2018
None on record
Dr Delyth Roberts Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record
Alec Coulson Trustee 16 November 2016
None on record
Catherine Nulty Trustee 07 May 2015
None on record
MARY BAILEY SRN Trustee
None on record