Governing document THE TURNER LONG FUND
Charity number: 227402
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 12/04/1939 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16/05/1984 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 27/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN CHELTENHAM
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CHELTENHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.