Trustees THE NORFOLK FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity Number: 227411

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET COLLINGWOOD | Chair | 02 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jane Geer | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jeary | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Winifred Reynolds | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Mrs Liz Barker | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jay Page | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL JONES | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY SANDERS | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Coral Batchelor | Trustee | 05 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN NINHAM | Trustee | 06 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA EVELYN REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.