THE SHEFFIELD, PEAK DISTRICT AND SOUTH YORKSHIRE BRANCH OF THE COUNCIL FOR THE PROTECTION OF RURAL ENGLAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 27 September 1963: Standard registration
- 29 January 2004: Removed
- 29 January 2004: Funds transferred to 1094975 PEAK DISTRICT AND SOUTH YORKSHIRE BRANCH OF THE CA...
- C P R E (Working name)
- CPRE (Working name)
- COUNCIL FOR THE PROTECTION OF RURAL ENGLAND (CPRE) SHEFFIELD, PEAK DISTRICT AND SOUTH YORKSHIRE BRANCH (Previous name)
- COUNCIL FOR THE PROTECTION OF RURAL ENGLAND (CPRE) SHEFFIELD,PEAK DISTRICT & SOUTH YORKSHIRE BRANCH (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 19 MAY 1931 AS AMENDED 20 JUNE 1981, 6 MAY 1989, 11 MAY 1991, 17 MAY 1997, 15 MAY 1999, 20 MAY 2000, 21 MAY 2002 AND 28 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND, PEAK DISTRICT AND SOUTH YORKSHIRE BRANCH, A COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE REGISTERED IN ENGLAND NO: 4496754, REGISTERED CHARITY NO. 1094975 ("CPRE PDSY BRANCH") IN ITS WORK TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE IMPROVEMENT, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE COUNTRYSIDE WITHIN THE ABOVE BOUNDARIES (SEE CLAUSE 1B OF CONSTITUTION) AND ITS TOWNS AND VILLAGES AND THE BETTER DEVELOPMENT OF THE RURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
SEE CLAUSE 1B OF CONSTITUTION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.