BILLINGHAM PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In order to generat sustainable finances the Club decided to lease their premises to a Child Care Nursery (TummyTicklers). Club members continue to hold a weekly meeting in the club premises each Thursday evening where they can socialize, have coffee, play bingo and hold raffles etc. Members have been able to enjoy more outings to the theatre, and dine out at various restaurants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 14 November 1963: Standard registration
- 22 November 2021: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1109792 DAISY CHAIN PROJECT TEESSIDE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.79k | £11.10k | £11.98k | £12.13k | £10.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.13k | £17.78k | £11.99k | £11.00k | £15.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 October 2021 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 October 2021 | 479 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 22 October 2021 | 845 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATE 27.7.1961
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL ACTIVITIES, OUTDOOR RECREATION, DAILY EXCURSIONS, AND TO ARRANGE HOLIDAYS FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED.
Area of benefit
BILLINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window