BILLINGSHURST CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Billingshurst Centre for community use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £145,148 from 3 government contract(s) and £145,148 from 3 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 06 April 1964: Standard registration
- THE BILLINGSHURST VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- THE VILLAGE HALL (BILLINGSHURST) FORMERLY KNOWN AS ST MARY'S HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BILLINGSHURST PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee | 09 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.29k | £93.54k | £172.01k | £197.37k | £314.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.60k | £105.50k | £252.03k | £171.32k | £350.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £145.15k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.42k | £85.23k | £92.57k | £145.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 18/11/1959 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/02/2012
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF ALL THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BILLINGSHURST
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BILLINGSHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
BILLINGSHURST PARISH COUNCIL
BILLINGHURST COMM & CONFERENCE CENT
ROMAN WAY
BILLINGSHURST
RH14 9QW
- Phone:
- 01403782555
- Email:
- council@billingshurst.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window