ST AUGUSTINE'S PASTORAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance to those in need within the Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bradford City
Governance
- 28 April 1964: Standard registration
- THE SICK AND POOR FUND - ST AUGUSTINE'S CHURCH OTLEY ROAD, BRADFORD (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rosemary Anne Fairhurst | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Ian O'Neil | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Gulland | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Clayton | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Naylor | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £457 | £3 | £4 | £2 | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £265 | £0 | £0 | £480 | £700 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
A CHURCH CUSTOM - ORIGIN UNKNOWN.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST THE SICK AND POOR WHO CALL UPON THE VICAR FROM TIME TO TIME, FOR SUCH ASSISTANCE AS HE CONSIDERS TO BE NEEDED TO BE GIVEN IN CASH IN FUNDS PERMIT AND ENTIRELY AT HIS DISCRETION.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF ST. AUGUSTINE'S CHURCH, OTLEY ROAD BRADFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. AUGUSTINES CHURCH
OTLEY ROAD
BRADFORD
BD3 0DR
- Phone:
- 01274775885
- Email:
- office.staugustine@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window