THE TOWN MOOR CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The effective maintenance of Newcastle Town Moor, overseeing investments and income generated to fund improvements to the Town Moor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 September 2023
Total income:
£804,898
Donations and legacies | £845 | |
Charitable activities | £612.55k | |
Other trading activities | £15.40k | |
Investments | £150.61k | |
Other | £25.49k |
Total expenditure:
£454,787
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £454.79k | |
Other | £0 |
-£92,092 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £454.79k | |
Retained for future use | £350.11k |
People

4 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HENRY DAVID WILSON | Chair | 09 October 1989 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Robert Markham Cooper | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henry Alder | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Summerhill | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA NESBITT | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Waugh | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP POWELL | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS BARON ATKINSON | Trustee | 08 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER GEORGE ATKINSON | Trustee | 08 October 2007 |
|
|||||
JAMES JOHNSON | Trustee | 06 October 2004 |
|
|
||||
ALAN ROBERT BAINBRIDGE | Trustee | 09 October 2000 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANDERSON | Trustee | 14 October 1985 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/09/2019 | 29/09/2020 | 29/09/2021 | 29/09/2022 | 29/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £849.38k | £548.34k | £644.76k | £695.57k | £804.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £740.61k | £402.31k | £522.79k | £539.40k | £454.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £4.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £1.95k | £2.36k | £1.60k | £845 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.53k | £5.79k | £5.07k | £7.86k | £15.40k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £604.87k | £380.43k | £433.84k | £460.14k | £612.55k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £96.65k | £93.71k | £100.31k | £122.24k | £150.61k | |
|
Income - Other | £139.32k | £66.47k | £103.19k | £103.72k | £25.49k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £740.61k | £402.31k | £522.79k | £539.40k | £454.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £51.11k | £37.56k | £34.20k | £39.43k | £48.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 29/09/2019 | 29/09/2020 | 29/09/2021 | 29/09/2022 | 29/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £28.07k | £24.19k | £21.83k | £28.98k | £55.67k | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.74m | £2.82m | £4.35m | £4.19m | £4.09m | |
|
Other assets | £2.68m | £2.71m | £1.74m | £1.98m | £2.62m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.42m | £1.29m | £1.25m | £1.34m | £1.65m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 September 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2019 | 05 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2019 | 05 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TOWN MOOR ACT 1774 THE NEWCASTLE-UPON-TYNE IMPROVEMENT ACT 1870, THE NEWCASTLE-UPON-TYNE CORPORATION ACT 1964 AND THE NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE MOORS ACT 1988.
Charitable objects
RIGHTS OF RESIDENT FREEMEN AND RESIDENT WIDOWS OF DECEASED FREEMEN TO HERBAGE OVER THE TOWN MOOR I.E. GRAZING RIGHTS FOR TWO MILCH COWS. THE NUMBER OF COWS TO BE PASTURED IS LIMITED TO 800, REPRESENTED BY AN EQUIVALENT NUMBER OF "STINT TICKETS" DISTRIBUTED TO THOSE SUCCESSFUL FREEMEN AND WIDOWS OF FREEMEN WHO APPLY. SECTION 11 OF THE 1870 ACT SETS OUT THE PROCEDURE AND IN TERMS SPECIFICALLY ACKNOWLEDGES AND PERMITS THE RECIPIENTS TO SELL THEIR STINT TICKETS FOR THE BEST PRICES OBTAINABLE.
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE-UPON-TYNE
Linked charities
- 18 November 1966 : Standard registration
- 27 October 1998 : Removed
- 27 October 1998 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moor Bank Lodge
Claremont Road
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE2 4NL
- Phone:
- 01912615970
- Email:
- admin@freemenofnewcastle.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window