WILLIAM AND HENRY WILKINSON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 227661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Wilkinson Trust was created to provide assistance to the poor or needy of the Parish of Millington cum Givendale. The Trustees will consider gifts of a monetary or material nature subject to the terms of the charity. All gifts are made in strict confidence.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £512
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Smith Trustee 03 March 2025
None on record
Shawn Leslie Smith Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record
Beverley Dyson Trustee 06 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £363 £3 £351 £380 £512
Total expenditure £500 £0 £300 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 03 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 January 2022 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE BUNGALOW
MILLINGTON
YORK
YO42 1TX
Phone:
01759303191
Website:

No information available