BROADWAY UNITED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing subsidised housing. Assisting underprivileged. Helping educational needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 November 1963: Standard registration
- 23 September 1996: Removed
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Elizabeth Davenport BA | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Joan Margaret Reading | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Nigel David Alan Robinson | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev MICHELLE WARD | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
SIMON JOHN PYM WILLIAMSON CFP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
KEVIN BEASLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Philip Clifford Whatmough | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.54k | £11.51k | £10.98k | £10.99k | £12.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.65k | £15.12k | £7.02k | £18.02k | £11.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 NOVEMBER 1965
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BROADWAY
Linked charities
- 19 November 1963 : Standard registration
- 23 September 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 Morris Road
Broadway
WR12 7RD
- Phone:
- 07741 456700
- Email:
- kbkbeasley@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window