MANSTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community and village gatherings. To act as a focal point for the village and surrounding communities. The hall to be hired out not only to support its finances but to encourage diverse activities, meeting groups and community interaction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa May Tandoh | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Mills | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Nicholas Wheeler | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.21k | £1.64k | £10.17k | £5.21k | £5.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.26k | £4.10k | £6.91k | £5.22k | £4.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | £4.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21 APRIL 1993.
Charitable objects
TO USE AND MAINTAIN THE DEMISED PREMISES AS A VILLAGE HALL OR INSTITUTE.
Area of benefit
MANSTON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manston & Hammoon Village Hall
Shaftesbury Road
Manston
Sturminster Newton
Dorset
DT10 1EX
- Phone:
- 07802362776
- Email:
- manstonbookings@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window