RELATE NORTH AND SOUTH WEST SUSSEX MARRIAGE GUIDANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 April 1964: Standard registration
- 25 April 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 April 2007: Funds transferred to 1115012 Relationships Sussex
- RELATE - NORTH & SOUTH WEST SUSSEX (Working name)
- RELATE NORTH SUSSEX MARRIAGE GUIDANCE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.24k | £220.83k | £244.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.50k | £219.96k | £225.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 17 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 04 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 19 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 29 July 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 13 October 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 25 February 2005 | 25 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JUNE 1982 AMENDED 22ND MAY 1989 AND AS AMENDED 3RD MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
(A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE INSTITUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO EMOTIONAL. PHYSICAL AND SEXUAL RELATIONSHIPS AND WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING PERSONAL RESPONSIBILITIES AND ENRICHING LIFE. (B) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF MARRIED LIFE AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF ALL SUCH RESEARCH. (C) TO SAFEGUARD AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN AND TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAK-UP OF THE MARRIAGE.
Area of benefit
CRAWLEY, EAST GRINSTEAD, HORSHAM, CHICHESTER AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window