Accounts and annual returns THE ANCOATS HOSPITAL TRUST FUND
Charity number: 227814
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 23 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | 02 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 23 September 2009 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 02 September 2009 | 125 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 13 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 30 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 24 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window