Financial history THE ANCOATS HOSPITAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 227814
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008 30/06/2009
Total gross income £1.78k £1.78k £1.80k £1.85k £1.79k
Total expenditure £1.14k £1.55k £1.71k £654 £575
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A