Accounts and annual returns THE DARLINGTON SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND AND VISUALLY IMPAIRED

Charity Number: 227903
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 21 February 2011 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 15 September 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 24 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 25 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required