THE WHITECHAPEL MISSION

Charity number: 227905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Daycentre for the homeless

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE WORKING LADS INSTITUTE (Previous name)
  • THE WORKING LADS INSTITUTE OF THE WHITECHAPEL MISSION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Spurr Chair 11 January 2018
PRISON RADIO ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE BUTLER TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Jenny Ann Impey Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev Jennifer Hunter Smith Trustee 13 June 2019
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION
Received: On time
Cheryl Gurnham Trustee 11 January 2018
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
Paul Hornsby Trustee 31 August 2011
None on record
Dr Keith Aldred PHD, CPFA Trustee
LOUGHTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 1 day late
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
PETER JACKSON BUTT BSC MBCS Trustee
BARKING DAGENHAM & ILFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: 3 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £1.09m £1.34m £1.63m £1.43m £1.41m
Total expenditure £983.47k £1.26m £1.42m £1.28m £1.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £878.66k £1.16m £1.43m £1.22m £1.16m
Income - Other trading activities £54.21k £55.51k £67.70k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £153.39k £125.94k £126.92k £0 £162.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £12.20k £0
Income - Investment £2.97k £1.32k £1.32k £42.71k £4.54k
Income - Other £0 £1.80k £0 £0 £81.25k
Income - Legacies £17.08k £2.00k £25.00k £142.35k £69.33k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £798.17k £997.79k £1.19m £1.05m £1.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £185.29k £80.78k £103.39k £86.38k £100.42k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £121.02k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £185.06k £127.97k £145.58k £137.75k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Own use assets £7.06m £7.07m £7.07m £7.10m £7.24m
Long-term investments £63.04k £40.85k £43.52k £42.71k £42.88k
Other assets £192.46k £353.87k £518.37k £449.47k £340.10k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £157.30k £234.97k £194.54k £194.54k £118.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 03 April 2024 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 03 April 2024 216 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 29 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 29 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 26 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 26 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 07 November 2020 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 07 November 2020 68 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WHITECHAPEL MISSION
212 WHITECHAPEL ROAD
LONDON
E1 1BJ
Phone:
02072478280