Accounts and annual returns OSBALDESTON'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 227908
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 07 April 2010 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 26 November 2009 26 days late
Annual return 31 December 2007 22 July 2009 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 25 November 2009 390 days late
Annual return 31 December 2006 06 January 2009 433 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 22 December 2008 418 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 22 July 2009 995 days late
Annual return 31 December 2004 13 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required