THE JUBILEE INSTITUTE, ROTHBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a place of recreation, social interaction and education for all the inhabitants within a 10 mile radius of Rothbury and in other parts of Upper Coquetdale.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 17 October 1963: Standard registration
- ROTHBURY JUBILEE HALL (Working name)
- THE JUBILEE INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graeme Leck | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Brown | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bob Mills | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Baugh | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alfred Bogyor | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cramman | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shona Walker | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Abbs | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.17k | £20.35k | £30.90k | £45.00k | £37.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.61k | £19.40k | £35.88k | £46.64k | £34.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.43k | £14.84k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 15 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE JUBILEE INSTITUTE, ROTHBURY FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF ROTHBURY, THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHIN A 10 MILE RADIUS AND UPPER COQUETDALE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jubilee Institute
Rothbury
MORPETH
NE65 7SD
- Phone:
- 01669 621861
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window