SHIPLEY BAPTIST CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £3,738 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 07 September 1965: Standard registration
- 06 March 2001: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iain Buglass | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Binder | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Marie Whitehouse | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Ann Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
The Revd Dr Keith Grant Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Martin Charles Butterworth | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||
STEVEN MICHAEL WALSHAW | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Lynne Froud | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.80k | £47.80k | £36.59k | £51.99k | £57.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.82k | £48.82k | £35.31k | £57.83k | £58.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | £3.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 01 October 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 01 October 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 2 MAY 1866 AND SCHEMES OF 17 JULY 1959, 14 SEPTEMBER 1972.
Charitable objects
FOR USE AS A CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 07 September 1965 : Standard registration
- 06 March 2001 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 SOMERSET AVENUE
BAILDON
SHIPLEY
BD17 5LS
- Phone:
- 01274592704
- Email:
- stevenwalshaw@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window