CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF CHARITY OF ST LOUIS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is involved in education, the relief of poverty, faith education, the allocation of grants to further research into education and the care and support of its older Sisters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Canada
- France
- Haiti
Governance
- 21 October 1963: Standard registration
- 25 May 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 May 2016: Funds transferred to 1160898 THE CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF CHARITY OF SAIN...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.07k | £235.93k | £227.34k | £208.08k | £211.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.76k | £222.38k | £218.95k | £173.75k | £411.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 18 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 18 May 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 23 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 23 June 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 11 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 11 June 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 21 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 21 May 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29TH JANUARY 1951 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF 14TH AUGUST 1961
Charitable objects
FOR RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window