Trustees JAMES MUSGRAVE'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 227950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Jefferies Trustee 06 July 2024
None on record
Professor Nicholas Wareham Trustee 09 November 2022
None on record
Rev Rachel Elizabeth Blanchflower Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
TOM HIPWELL Trustee 12 October 2017
None on record
Helen Jackson Trustee 17 January 2014
None on record