NEWBIGGIN BY THE SEA WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable women who are interested in issues associated with rural life including arts, crafts and sciences to improve and develope conditions of rural life, to advance their education and citizenship in public questions both national and international, in music, drama and other cultural subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northumberland
Governance
- 19 September 1963: Standard registration
- WOODHORN AND NEWBIGGIN WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gladys Campbell | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Carr | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rose Edwards | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Parnaby | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.10k | £8.10k | £8.29k | £20.61k | £4.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.02k | £7.82k | £9.60k | £4.16k | £15.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 488 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 488 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 JUNE 1937. MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED) AS AMENDED 04 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE.
Area of benefit
NEWBIGGIN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Womens Institute Hall
Long Park
NEWBIGGIN-BY-THE-SEA
Northumberland
NE64 6PN
- Phone:
- 07484 858168
- Email:
- newbigginwi@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window