SHENSTONE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEF OF NEED WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES ON THE ANCIENT PARISH OF SHENSTONE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 26 September 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr WARWICK GREW | Chair |
|
||||||
Rev Jeremy Edgar Bakewell | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Stuart Alan Jones | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Peacock | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Robert Beilby | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR KEITH SEARS SEARS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JACKIE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR COLIN FISHWICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER OSBORN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.28k | £14.54k | £14.55k | £15.55k | £17.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.02k | £3.07k | £1.12k | £3.55k | £10.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26 SEPTEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 4 MARCH 1976.
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF SHENSTONE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 26 AND 27 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF SHENSTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 FOOTHERLEY ROAD
SHENSTONE
LICHFIELD
WS14 0NJ
- Phone:
- 01543 480326
- Email:
- k.goldsworthy@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window