WOMEN'S INSTITUTE MARLOW BOTTOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GARDENING CRAFT READING GROUPS ART CLUB WALKING GROUP SOCIAL COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 14 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARION KIRKLEY | Chair | 20 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Carole Anne Addison | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chrystine Maja Poole | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Yvonne Livett | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Houillebecq | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Ann Haines | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margery Ann Gordon-Cumming | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Garrett | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr JUNE CHRISTINE MORETTO | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY TILBURY | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE TIGHT | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
VIV MCKEE | Trustee | 08 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ANNE POOLEY | Trustee | 08 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
PERI WING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.51k | £6.59k | £6.36k | £13.65k | £14.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.01k | £6.39k | £4.96k | £15.95k | £13.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE TO WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION, AND PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
MARLOW BOTTOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Ragmans Close
Marlow
MARLOW
Selec
SL7 3QW
- Phone:
- 01628486281
- Email:
- marlowbottomwi@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window