Accounts and annual returns THE SISTERS OF THE DIVINE SAVIOUR

Charity number: 228082
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 04 September 2017 27 November 2018 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2017 27 November 2018 146 days late
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 29 April 2016 On Time