Financial history THE SISTERS OF THE DIVINE SAVIOUR

Charity Number: 228082
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 04/09/2017
Total gross income £70.70k £68.03k £63.84k £67.53k £41.26k
Total expenditure £116.12k £100.43k £99.88k £117.43k £969.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0