THE MARGARET COLLINS CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes small grants to individuals at Christmas time in the City of Chester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 02 July 1963: Standard registration
- 10 January 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93 | £93 | £2.78k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £190 | £100 | £0 | £180 | £90 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 11 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 16 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 17 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 22 DECEMBER 1924
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF POOR AND DESERVING WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS OVER THE AGE OF FIFTY AND POOR AND DESERVING MEN OVER THE AGE OF SIXTY RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF CHESTER.
Area of benefit
CITY OF CHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window