SOUP KITCHEN CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The yearly income of the charity is donated to voluntary and community groups within the Chester area who supply necessities to people 'in need', work with older and/or disabled people; provide care and support for children and/or young persons; provide accommodation for homeless clients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 21 May 1963: Standard registration
- 22 September 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1143711 CHESHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/03/2016 | 22/03/2017 | 22/03/2018 | 22/03/2019 | 22/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.04k | £5.11k | £4.92k | £4.99k | £4.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.30k | £7.46k | £9.70k | £6.19k | £5.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 22 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 22 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 22 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 22 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 March 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME 23RD NOVEMBER 1926 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/10/2015
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE CITY OF CHESTER. (SEE SCHEME 23RD NOVEMBER 1926 FOR MEANS OF APPLICATION)
Area of benefit
CITY OF CHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window