BRISTOL OLD VIC AND THEATRE ROYAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 228235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To produce year-round seasons of high quality, exciting drama in the historic auditorium serviced by a fit-for-purpose 21st century facility To provide an extensive programme of outreach work inspired by the repertoire and the needs of the local and regional communities To take the lead in the local and regional theatre and cultural scene To safeguard the heritage of the Theatre Royal building

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 October 1963: Standard registration
  • 18 March 2019: Funds received from 266559 THE RONALD DUNCAN LITERARY FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE BRISTOL OLD VIC TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timi Oni Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Elisabeth Byrne Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Christopher Francis Sharp Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
LaToyah McAllister-Jones Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Aisha Thomas Trustee 13 December 2023
None on record
Nicholas Aaron Jeremy Lee Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Anna-Sophie Beatrice Brendel Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Folake Mobolaji Adekola Trustee 12 July 2022
None on record
BERNARD DONOGHUE Trustee 21 July 2021
THE NATIONAL MUSEUM OF LABOUR HISTORY
Received: On time
Suneeta Sellers Trustee 27 November 2019
None on record
Craig Cheney Trustee 25 September 2019
PERIOD FRIENDLY PLACES
Received: On time
Katherine Frances Anthony Wilkinson Trustee 25 September 2019
None on record
DAVID SPROXTON Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
Chinoyerem ODIMBA Trustee 26 July 2017
None on record
CLAIRE MICHELLE HISCOTT Trustee 30 November 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.66m £3.80m £5.57m £5.80m £6.53m
Total expenditure £5.70m £4.07m £6.80m £7.36m £8.15m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.53m £2.26m £2.16m £1.42m £1.36m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.04m £3.30m £2.52m £1.95m £1.98m
Income - Other trading activities £463.36k £95.52k £884.23k £1.45m £1.84m
Income - Charitable activities £2.15m £401.15k £2.16m £2.40m £2.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.66k £4.42k £2.49k £170 £35.62k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £19.16k £0 £16.23k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.99m £3.46m £5.54m £5.21m £5.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £545.35k £436.14k £532.17k £795.80k £785.35k
Expenditure - Governance £10.91k £12.34k £13.62k £23.42k £23.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £168.15k £177.80k £729.18k £1.35m £1.57m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £17.07m £15.85m £14.66m £13.46m £12.33m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.56m £3.34m £2.87m £2.70m £2.60m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.58m £1.42m £984.82k £1.17m £1.57m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bristol Old Vic
King Street
Bristol
BS1 4ED
Phone:
01179493993