THE LOPPING ENDOWMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carrying on and maintaining Lopping Hall which was erected for the benefit of the householders of Loughton in substitution for their ancient right of lopping within Epping Forest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 25 September 1969: Standard registration
- THE LOUGHTON LOPPING ENDOWMENT FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Lopping Endowment Corporate Trustee Limited | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.43k | £147.45k | £134.38k | £113.77k | £163.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.70k | £115.55k | £131.12k | £145.81k | £161.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16 AUGUST 1881 BY THE ARBITRATOR AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 6 AUGUST 1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/02/2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY HALL (KNOWN AS LOPPING HALL) FOR THE PERMANENT BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF LOUGHTON, IN SUBSTITUTION OF THEIR ANCIENT RIGHT OF LOPPING WITHIN EPPING FOREST, WHICH CEASED BY FORCE OF THE EPPING FOREST ACT 1878
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF LOUGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOPPING HALL
189 HIGH ROAD
LOUGHTON
IG10 4LF
- Phone:
- 02085081660
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window