WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - COPMANTHORPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purpose of the WI organisation are to enable women who are interested in issues associated with rural life including arts, crafts and sciences, to improve & develop conditions of rural life, to advance their education in citizenship, in public questions both national & international, in music, drama & other cultural subjects & in all branches of agriculture, handicrafts, home economics, h
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of York
Governance
- 01 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHAEL BLACK | Chair | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Louise King | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Nixon | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Wallace | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diana Johnson | Trustee | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bardet | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
VICKI DOUGALL | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH WYATT | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.72k | £24.53k | £13.79k | £8.13k | £14.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.37k | £30.17k | £16.24k | £5.30k | £7.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.77k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
COPMANTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WI Hall
6 Station Road
Copmanthorpe
York
YO23 3SX
- Phone:
- 01904270696
- Email:
- copmanthorpewi@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window