Trustees WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - COPMANTHORPE
Charity number: 228283

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHAEL BLACK | Chair | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Louise King | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Nixon | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Wallace | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diana Johnson | Trustee | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bardet | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
VICKI DOUGALL | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH WYATT | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.