HENRY HANSON POOR FUND
Charity Number: 228286
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benevolence donations to Ebenezer Methodist Church members and attenders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2010
Total income: £19
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Calderdale
Governance
Registration history:
- 17 January 1964: Standard registration
- 11 July 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/02/2006 | 20/02/2007 | 20/02/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47 | £41 | £0 | £36 | £19 | |
|
Total expenditure | £47 | £25 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 28 March 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 22 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 February 2008 | 30 December 2008 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 February 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 February 2007 | 04 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 February 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 23 OCTOBER 1899
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE CHURCH AND CONGREGATION OF THE EBENEZER METHODIST CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HALIFAX
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
DEED DATED 3RD FEBRUARY 1911.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH AND CONGREGATION OF THE EBENEZER METHODIST CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
HALIFAX
Registration history
- 17 January 1964 : Standard registration
- 11 July 2011 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window