Financial history BLACKFRIARS ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 228391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £447.03k £285.67k £378.20k £548.09k £624.99k
Total expenditure £482.97k £188.95k £319.90k £437.39k £568.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £57.03k £10.67k N/A £130.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £174.50k £149.49k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £51.68k £58.24k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £317.02k £390.08k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £414 £2.44k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £4.47k £24.74k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £437.39k £568.78k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0