Trustees BLACKFRIARS ARTS CENTRE LIMITED
Charity number: 228391

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CHRISTOPHER BARCLAY | Chair | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Poulson | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stuart Bull | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Rowett | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Cooke | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Lawman | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annette Jeanette Stewart | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Adrian Philip Reed | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GRANT | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL JACKSON | Trustee | 30 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BRIAN GIBSON | Trustee | 30 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.